NY S01789 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - SIGNED CHAP.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that domestic violence advocates may not disclose any communication made by a client to the advocate except in certain circumstances including after the consent of the client or if the client reveals an intent to commit a crime.
Title
Establishes that domestic violence advocates may not disclose any communication made by a client to the advocate except in certain circumstances including after the consent of the client or if the client reveals an intent to commit a crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.309 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.103 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | substituted for a2520 |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.408 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02520 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - substituted by s1789