NY S01822 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes senior citizen students auditing community college classes in the full time equivalent state aid formula.
Title
Includes senior citizen students auditing community college classes in the full time equivalent state aid formula.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-25 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO AGING | |
2009-05-11 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2009-02-09 | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A4776 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - referred to higher education