NY S01822 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts from sales tax the sale of an abstract of title to real property to be used for agricultural purposes to either a prospective purchaser of real property or to an attorney representing a prospective purchaser.
Title
Exempts from sales tax the sale of an abstract of title to real property to be used for agricultural purposes to either a prospective purchaser of real property or to an attorney representing a prospective purchaser.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.343 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.551 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01530 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to ways and means