NY S01824 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1571
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to access to viable agricultural land for new and beginning farmers.
Title
Relates to access to viable agricultural land for new and beginning farmers.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Marc Panepinto [D] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1571 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1262 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01571 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - tabled