NY S01866 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the description of the bounded area for which the residential parking permit system in the village of Tuckahoe in the county of Westchester may be established.
Title
Relates to the description of the bounded area for which the residential parking permit system in the village of Tuckahoe in the county of Westchester may be established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | referred to transportation | |
2010-03-15 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-03-15 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-03-15 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2010-03-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-02-24 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-02-23 | 1ST REPORT CAL.166 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-01-06 | returned to senate | |
2010-01-06 | died in assembly | |
2009-06-04 | referred to transportation | |
2009-06-04 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-06-04 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-06-04 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-03-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-03-25 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-03-24 | 1ST REPORT CAL.119 | |
2009-02-09 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A896 (Same As) 2010-06-15 - held for consideration in transportation