NY S01885 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification requirements for school districts located in cities with a population of one million or more when a school district chooses to acquire a site for a new school.
Title
Relates to notification requirements for school districts located in cities with a population of one million or more when a school district chooses to acquire a site for a new school.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.688 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1166 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01296 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education