NY S01978 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes active duty military and certain veterans going to college under the new GI bill in the definition of resident as it relates to community colleges and state-aided four-year colleges.
Title
Includes active duty military and certain veterans going to college under the new GI bill in the definition of resident as it relates to community colleges and state-aided four-year colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2014-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.833 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1229 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07162 (Same As) 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in higher education