NY S02004 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2004C
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2004C
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ALS (Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis) research and education; creates the New York ALS research and education fund.
Title
Relates to ALS (Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis) research and education; creates the New York ALS research and education fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2004C |
2014-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2004B |
2014-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2004A |
2013-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-04-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01169 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - amended on third reading 1169c