NY S02034 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to extend the power of impeachment and trial of impeachment to any former office holder for impeachable conduct committed while such person was in office; provides for disqualification of such person from holding public office in the future.
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to extend the power of impeachment and trial of impeachment to any former office holder for impeachable conduct committed while such person was in office; provides for disqualification of such person from holding public office in the future.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Peter Oberacker [R] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-04 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-02-23 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-01-20 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |