NY S02037 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows municipal commissions to use alternate lists for filling vacancies with resident and non-resident minority group members and women in order to achieve diversity in police departments.
Title
Allows municipal commissions to use alternate lists for filling vacancies with resident and non-resident minority group members and women in order to achieve diversity in police departments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-06-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2037D |
2015-06-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2037C |
2015-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2037B |
2015-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-05-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2037A |
2015-05-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02804 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to governmental employees