NY S02077 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.514
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until twelve years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Title
Extends the provisions relating to the New York state thoroughbred breeding and development fund until twelve years after the commencement of the operation of a video lottery terminal facility at Aqueduct racetrack.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.514 |
2023-09-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.107 |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | substituted for a3566 |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2023-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.336 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A03566 (Same As) 2023-04-17 - substituted by s2077