NY S02124 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows physician assistants to serve as primary care practitioners for purposes of Medicaid managed care plans.
Title
Allows physician assistants to serve as primary care practitioners for purposes of Medicaid managed care plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.447 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.249 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07725 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - reported referred to ways and means