NY S02147 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - VETOED MEMO.234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-21 - VETOED MEMO.234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioners of agriculture and markets and economic development to study and develop a long-term strategy for sustaining farming and food production in New York state; strategy shall be based on an analysis of land use and economic trends, soil and natural resources, food consumption needs and other factors necessary to develop a state-level blueprint for protecting farmland and strengthening food production in the state.
Title
Directs the commissioners of agriculture and markets and economic development to study and develop a long-term strategy for sustaining farming and food production in New York state; strategy shall be based on an analysis of land use and economic trends, soil and natural resources, food consumption needs and other factors necessary to develop a state-level blueprint for protecting farmland and strengthening food production in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-21 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.234 |
2013-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.585 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a728 |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2013-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.522 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A00728 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - substituted by s2147