NY S02183 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conferring youthful offender status upon conviction of an eligible youth for a misdemeanor.
Title
Relates to conferring youthful offender status upon conviction of an eligible youth for a misdemeanor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.212 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00718 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.37