NY S02186 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A962A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A962A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that persons with hemophilia and other clotting protein deficiencies who are otherwise eligible for the Child Health Plus program shall have access to reimbursement for outpatient blood clotting factor concentrates and other necessary treatments and services.
Title
Provides that persons with hemophilia and other clotting protein deficiencies who are otherwise eligible for the Child Health Plus program shall have access to reimbursement for outpatient blood clotting factor concentrates and other necessary treatments and services.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Michael Nozzolio [R] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A962A |
2013-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1425 |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2186A |
2013-05-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00962 (Same As) 2013-10-23 - signed chap.428