NY S02196 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of "direct relationship" for the purposes of article 23-A of the correction law regarding licensures and employment of persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of "direct relationship" for the purposes of article 23-A of the correction law regarding licensures and employment of persons previously convicted of one or more criminal offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.947
2019-01-23SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A07937 (Same As) 2019-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.206

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback