NY S02226 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-21 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enables veterans to receive benefit information upon applying for or renewing a driver's license.
Title
Enables veterans to receive benefit information upon applying for or renewing a driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2014-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.649 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2226B |
2014-03-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2226A |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.336 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01753 (Same As) 2014-03-26 - print number 1753c