NY S02244 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an emergency evacuation plan for individuals with disabilities; establishes $500 fine for failure to comply with such plan within one year of the effective date.
Title
Establishes an emergency evacuation plan for individuals with disabilities; establishes $500 fine for failure to comply with such plan within one year of the effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] | Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2015-06-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A02200 (Same As) 2016-03-31 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT