NY S02261 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-29 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an affirmative defense against patronizing a prostitute.
Title
Establishes an affirmative defense against patronizing a prostitute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2014-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.752 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-03-27 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-03-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-03-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.256 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04088 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to codes