NY S02322 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of aggravated harassment of a police officer or peace officer; provides for such an offense to be a class E felony.
Title
Establishes the crime of aggravated harassment of a police officer or peace officer; provides for such an offense to be a class E felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-03-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.418 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.559 |
2011-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A00875 (Same As) 2011-05-11 - enacting clause stricken
A08099 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to codes
A08099 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to codes