NY S02333 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a taxpayer abuse sanction to be imposed against the income of a public officer who commits certain felonies related to his or her service as a public officer.
Title
Establishes a taxpayer abuse sanction to be imposed against the income of a public officer who commits certain felonies related to his or her service as a public officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2011-04-13 | Senate | DEFEATED IN CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2011-03-18 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |