NY S02342 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2342A
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - PRINT NUMBER 2342A
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York state tourism website to be displayed in any advertisement or public service announcement funded by state money.
Title
Requires the New York state tourism website to be displayed in any advertisement or public service announcement funded by state money.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2342A |
2012-04-13 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2011-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07102 (Same As) 2012-05-08 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION