NY S02349 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a voter may register to vote at any residence to which the voter maintains a continuous connection with an intent to remain, including a second home or a vacation home or a home where a student lives while attending a college or university.
Title
Provides that a voter may register to vote at any residence to which the voter maintains a continuous connection with an intent to remain, including a second home or a vacation home or a home where a student lives while attending a college or university.
Sponsors
Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-05-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.461 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2349A |
2023-02-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ELECTIONS |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |