NY S02383 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain information to be filed with the department of public service.
Title
Requires certain information to be filed with the department of public service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.121 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |