NY S02392 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to child support for children attending a college ROTC program, a military college, a military preparatory school or one of the United States military academies.
Title
Relates to child support for children attending a college ROTC program, a military college, a military preparatory school or one of the United States military academies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2016-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1219 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1351 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2392A |
2015-05-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2015-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08249 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to judiciary