NY S02393 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health insurance issuers to certify that at least a majority of prescription drug rebates are provided to patients at the point of sale.
Title
Requires certain health insurance issuers to certify that at least a majority of prescription drug rebates are provided to patients at the point of sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Cordell Cleare [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2023-10-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2393B |
2023-10-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2023-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2393A |
2023-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01962 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - print number 1962a