NY S02406 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for medical professionals, including two hours of course work encompassing minority healthcare issues.
Title
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for medical professionals, including two hours of course work encompassing minority healthcare issues.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.383 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2406A |
2020-02-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1239 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02886 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education