NY S02426 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates the practice of student debt consultants by establishing prohibitions and requiring certain disclosures.
Title
Regulates the practice of student debt consultants by establishing prohibitions and requiring certain disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.593 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.868 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2426A |
2019-04-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A03408 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REFERRED TO BANKS