NY S02428 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Westchester county board of elections to merge any election district with 50 or fewer registered voters into an existing election district.
Title
Authorizes the Westchester county board of elections to merge any election district with 50 or fewer registered voters into an existing election district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2011-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03483 (Same As) 2011-01-25 - referred to election law
A09001 (Same As) 2012-01-13 - referred to election law
A09001 (Same As) 2012-01-13 - referred to election law