NY S02431 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires air quality monitoring of certain major mass transportation projects that involve an excavation operation within a city having a population of one million or more.
Title
Requires air quality monitoring of certain major mass transportation projects that involve an excavation operation within a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1137 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04762 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation