NY S02461 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - signed chap.225
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-16 - signed chap.225
Summary
Gives the attorney general explicit authority to take proof, determine facts, and issue subpoenas pursuant to civil practice law and rules, in proceedings to compel compliance with title 1 of article 7 of the general obligations law relating to money held in trust in certain cases; requires money deposited as security to be held in trust in certain rental cases; authorizes court to award attorney general costs of investigation for maximum of $2,000 with respect to each named respondent.
Title
Gives the attorney general explicit authority to take proof, determine facts, and issue subpoenas pursuant to civil practice law and rules, in proceedings to compel compliance with title 1 of article 7 of the general obligations law relating to money held in trust in certain cases; requires money deposited as security to be held in trust in certain rental cases; authorizes court to award attorney general costs of investigation for maximum of $2,000 with respect to each named respondent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2500 | |
2009-05-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-20 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-19 | 1ST REPORT CAL.387 | |
2009-04-21 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-02-20 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02500 (Same As) 2009-07-16 - signed chap.225
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S02461&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |