NY S02514 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the department of transportation to issue seasonal agricultural permits for oversize vehicles.
Title
Allows the department of transportation to issue seasonal agricultural permits for oversize vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.697 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00475 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation