NY S02520 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2520B
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2520B
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a real property tax exemption for certain eligible reservists upon adoption of a local law, ordinance or resolution providing therefor; requires property of such eligible reservists to be his or her primary residence; such reservist must have retained his or her active duty status for at least 90 consecutive days to claim such tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes a real property tax exemption for certain eligible reservists upon adoption of a local law, ordinance or resolution providing therefor; requires property of such eligible reservists to be his or her primary residence; such reservist must have retained his or her active duty status for at least 90 consecutive days to claim such tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2520B |
2018-01-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.562 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2520A |
2017-03-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08711 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - print number 8711a