NY S02550 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state educating leaders for excellence in community transformation program to provide loan forgiveness and scholarship awards to certain students who demonstrate excellence in student government, civic organizations, or through campus or community leadership activities.
Title
Establishes the New York state educating leaders for excellence in community transformation program to provide loan forgiveness and scholarship awards to certain students who demonstrate excellence in student government, civic organizations, or through campus or community leadership activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.784 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2550A |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1540 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |