NY S02572 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to penalties for the promotion of prison contraband; amends the definition of dangerous contraband and amends the promotion of prison contraband in the first degree to a class C felony.
Title
Relates to penalties for the promotion of prison contraband; amends the definition of dangerous contraband and amends the promotion of prison contraband in the first degree to a class C felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.622 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2572A |
2018-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1309 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09577 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - referred to codes