NY S02598 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes additional fines when a person fails to pay his or her fines or fails to complete counseling or community service when mandated for unlawful possession of marihuana or unlawful possession of an alcoholic beverage.
Title
Imposes additional fines when a person fails to pay his or her fines or fails to complete counseling or community service when mandated for unlawful possession of marihuana or unlawful possession of an alcoholic beverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1429 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04327 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes