NY S02615 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ticket pricing and extends certain provisions of the arts and cultural affairs law.
Title
Relates to ticket pricing and extends certain provisions of the arts and cultural affairs law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-06-25 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.553 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06805 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development