NY S02641 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to marine and coastal district party and charter boat licenses; provides that the department of environmental conservation may permit reissuance of a license to a member of the immediate family of the prior holder of such license; provided that the individual to whom the license or permit is being reissued is at least sixteen years of age; makes related provisions.
Title
Relates to marine and coastal district party and charter boat licenses; provides that the department of environmental conservation may permit reissuance of a license to a member of the immediate family of the prior holder of such license; provided that the individual to whom the license or permit is being reissued is at least sixteen years of age; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.683 |
2011-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03732 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to environmental conservation