NY S02648 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-23 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Protects certain information on hunting, fishing and trapping license and permit applications from disclosure or release outside of the department of environmental conservation.
Title
Protects certain information on hunting, fishing and trapping license and permit applications from disclosure or release outside of the department of environmental conservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-23 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2012-01-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.30 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-04-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-04-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-04-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.108 |
2011-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07618 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to environmental conservation