NY S02680 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-25 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the granting of academic credit at state or city operated institutions to veterans.
Title
Allows the granting of academic credit at state or city operated institutions to veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2022-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1130 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-02-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.219 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-01-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2680A |
2021-01-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08255 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education