NY S02687 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the governor to fill vacancy in the office of lieutenant-governor on confirmation of both houses of the legislature; allows the governor to leave the state without transmitting power to lieutenant-governor and establishes the process for lieutenant-governor to act as governor during incapacitation of the governor.
Title
Authorizes the governor to fill vacancy in the office of lieutenant-governor on confirmation of both houses of the legislature; allows the governor to leave the state without transmitting power to lieutenant-governor and establishes the process for lieutenant-governor to act as governor during incapacitation of the governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-01 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |