NY S02690 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 2690A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 2690A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for aquaculture and shellfish regulation.
Title
Provides for aquaculture and shellfish regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2690A |
2014-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04617 (Same As) 2014-01-31 - print number 4617a