NY S02690 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides notice of health insurance contracts for retired officers, employees, and their families.
Title
Provides notice of health insurance contracts for retired officers, employees, and their families.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.468 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |