NY S02705 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts low-emission and energy efficient vehicles from retail sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Exempts low-emission and energy efficient vehicles from retail sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2705A |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A01790 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means