NY S02711 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2711A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2711A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates step therapy and first fail health insurance policies and contracts.
Title
Regulates step therapy and first fail health insurance policies and contracts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2711A |
2014-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2013-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A05214 (Same As) 2014-02-13 - print number 5214a