NY S02724 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5151B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5151B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides student health certificates may include a diabetes risk analysis; amends provisions relating to school district nutrition advisory committees.
Title
Provides student health certificates may include a diabetes risk analysis; amends provisions relating to school district nutrition advisory committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5151B |
2017-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2724B |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-15 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 2724A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.830 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05151 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - signed chap.183