NY S02750 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that all members of the board of regents shall be elected by concurrent resolution of the legislature on the second Tuesday of March, regardless if such election is to fill the expired term of a regent or to fill the unexpired term of a regent.
Title
Provides that all members of the board of regents shall be elected by concurrent resolution of the legislature on the second Tuesday of March, regardless if such election is to fill the expired term of a regent or to fill the unexpired term of a regent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.110 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-03-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.370 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |