NY S02777 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-09 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that no person acting as a political party chairperson, an elected public officer, an individual who is subject to the rules established by the commission on public integrity and any other person who is an officer of an organization, association or corporation that receives public funding shall be elected as a delegate to a constitutional convention.
Title
Requires that no person acting as a political party chairperson, an elected public officer, an individual who is subject to the rules established by the commission on public integrity and any other person who is an officer of an organization, association or corporation that receives public funding shall be elected as a delegate to a constitutional convention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-04-27 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.270 |
2011-02-07 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2011-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04932 (Same As) 2012-02-16 - opinion referred to judiciary