NY S02847 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates an education and outreach program for the autoimmune disease known as lupus; provides for an advisory council consisting of representatives of people with lupus and their families and health care providers who specialize in treating lupus; appropriates funds for the lupus education and awareness program.
Title
Creates an education and outreach program for the autoimmune disease known as lupus; provides for an advisory council consisting of representatives of people with lupus and their families and health care providers who specialize in treating lupus; appropriates funds for the lupus education and awareness program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO HEALTH | |
2009-03-18 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HEALTH | |
2009-03-04 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A8946 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - held for consideration in ways and means