NY S02849 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to directing the commissioner of health to conduct a study on the feasibility of creating a burn center in Kings County Medical Center in collaboration with SUNY Downstate Medical Center's University Hospital of Brooklyn.
Title
Relates to directing the commissioner of health to conduct a study on the feasibility of creating a burn center in Kings County Medical Center in collaboration with SUNY Downstate Medical Center's University Hospital of Brooklyn.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-03-10 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2017-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01024 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means